FRIENDS OF COCKERMOUTH SWIMMING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to support the swimmers of Cockermouth Swimming Club. Any activities which will raise these funds - raffles, bag packing in local stores, applications for local grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Cumbria
Governance
- 11 August 2015: Standard registration
- FROCS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Ruth Brough | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bailey | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Alexandra Nicols | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE JENKINSON | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA NELSON | Trustee | 04 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.49k | £11.71k | £2.04k | £800 | £800 | |
|
Total expenditure | £373 | £1.51k | £1.27k | £1.18k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 09 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND FUNDS FOR THE RUNNING OF COCKERMOUTH AMATEUR SWIMMING CLUB FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clifton Green Farm
Little Clifton
COCKERMOUTH
Workington
Cumbria
CA14 1YT
- Phone:
- 0190065639
- Email:
- Benarbia_ali2003@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window