CLARBESTON ROAD ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of Clarbeston Road AFC is the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities for the playing of association football for boys and girls from all mini and junior age groups from 5 to 16 years and for both adult male and female teams. The club also provides access to pan-disability football though the Clarby Warriors team.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
84 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 08 September 2015: CIO registration
- CLARBESTON ROAD AFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE BROWN | Chair | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Constable | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sian O'Sullivan | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Jason Wall | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Ian Eynon | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Owen Davies | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
OWEN LLEWELLIN ROBERTS | Trustee | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNY LEWIS | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BLAKE BROMLEY HND | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN STRETCH BSC PGCE | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.53k | £93.18k | £62.51k | £53.13k | £60.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.01k | £87.48k | £54.21k | £61.07k | £72.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.21k | £11.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 08 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Homelea
Lamborough Crescent
CLARBESTON ROAD
Pembrokeshire
SA63 4UZ
- Phone:
- 01437731100
- Email:
- steve.stretch@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window