SOUTH DERBYSHIRE MINERS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the conditions of life for those living in South Derbyshire and to help those beneficiaries who are in a position of need, hardship or distress by giving monetary grants to pay for items, services or facilities to releive their position
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 July 1977: Standard registration
- 22 October 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 22 October 2009: Funds transferred to 1015581 THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT MINERS RECREATION AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY (Previous name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT MINERS' RECREATION AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY (Previous name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT MINERS RECREATION GROUND FUND (Previous name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT MINERS' RECREATION GROUND FUND (Previous name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT MINERS RECREATION GROUND FUND AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY (Previous name)
- SOUTH DERBYSHIRE MINERS' CHARITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | £294 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.08k | £118 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 02 September 2008 | 307 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 23 October 2007 | 722 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 23 October 2007 | 722 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 30 NOVEMBER 1989, AS AMENDED ON 29 JUNE 2000 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFICIARIES FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH BENEFICIARIES. B) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OF PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH BENEFICIARIES. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 14 OF THE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
SOUTH DERBYSHIRE DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window