BODHI COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DELIVERING STUDY COURSES IN EARLY BUDDHISM IN THE UK AND MAINLAND EUROPE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Belgium
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Switzerland
Governance
- 26 August 2015: Standard registration
- T/A BODHI INSTITUTE (Working name)
- BODHI SANGHA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Mountford Graham Williams | Chair | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Anne Speckens | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Livecchi | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Walter Young | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oga Cho | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA RUSLING | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brigitte Huber-Jordi | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.21k | £95.55k | £205.45k | £250.57k | £264.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241.91k | £75.79k | £133.76k | £236.99k | £251.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 APR 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
NOT FOR PROFIT EDUCATIONAL ORGANISATION LIMITED BY GUARANTEE FOR THE CRITICAL EXAMINATION AND PRACTICAL CULTIVATION OF BUDDHIST TEACHINGS AS FOUND IN THE EARLIEST STRATA OF THE BUDDHIST CANON. THE BODHI SANGHA IS NON-SECTARIAN AND UNALIGNED WITH ANY BUDDHIST ORTHODOXY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 DARTSIDE
TOTNES
TQ9 5HL
- Phone:
- 01626897636
- Email:
- admin@bodhi-college.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window