WOMEN INTEGRATION FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gereral charitable Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Hackney
- Lambeth
- Burkina Faso
- Ghana
- Ivory Coast
Governance
- 16 February 2016: Standard registration
- AWIF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOLANDE DELPHINE KEDJA | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMONE WOHI | Trustee | 11 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANNY GBOE | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.37k | £1.20k | £9.70k | £11.80k | £8.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.36k | £11.60k | £8.20k | £10.60k | £7.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 February 2023 | 385 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 February 2023 | 750 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUN 2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/11/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, WOMEN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, AND THE OBJECTS CAN BE ACHIEVED BY DELIVERING THE FOLLOWING ACTIVITIES: A. EMPLOYMENT TRAINING B. ENGLISH CLASSES FOR ADULT (ESOL) C. HEALTH PROMOTION AND D. RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES D) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 57
Pitcairn House
St. Thomas's Square
London
E9 6PU
- Phone:
- 02070416498
- Email:
- wforum57@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window