SAFETY NET (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the recovery of all those affected by rape, exploitation, sexual and domestic abuse across Cumbria. Our holistic and trauma informed services offer advice, support, advocacy and therapy. 1:1 work in schools, plus workshops and training. Support groups Training and Education. Work in schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£956,596
Donations and legacies | £64.79k | |
Charitable activities | £875.12k | |
Other trading activities | £7.60k | |
Investments | £9.08k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£903,231
Raising funds | £24.57k | |
Charitable activities | £878.66k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £486,312 from 3 government contract(s) and £35,298 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £24.57k | |
Charitable expenditure | £878.66k | |
Retained for future use | £53.37k |
People

21 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Hancock | Chair | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Travers | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Aurelia | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hattrick | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Michelle DIXON | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £558.40k | £617.41k | £671.85k | £844.50k | £956.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £649.65k | £555.41k | £573.37k | £833.62k | £903.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £133.23k | £269.31k | £360.33k | £466.64k | £486.31k | |
|
Income from government grants | £126.59k | £124.00k | £125.93k | N/A | £35.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £526.47k | £888 | £4.90k | £63.39k | £64.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.97k | £0 | £0 | £14.22k | £7.60k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £18.96k | £616.42k | £497.13k | £298.13k | £875.12k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £98 | £112 | £2.11k | £9.08k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £169.71k | £466.64k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £623.22k | £537.78k | £557.98k | £811.12k | £878.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £26.43k | £17.63k | £15.40k | £22.51k | £24.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £4.00k | £4.00k | £23.42k | £23.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.16k | £5.37k | £4.03k | £3.02k | £2.26k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £242.59k | £310.89k | £427.33k | £449.63k | £568.93k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £19.71k | £24.22k | £40.84k | £51.26k | £116.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
(1)TO RELIEVE THE TRAUMA AND DISTRESS OF VICTIMS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS THEREOF OF RAPE, INDECENT ASSAULT, SEXUAL ABUSE, SEXUAL HARASSMENT, CHILD SEXUAL ABUSE AND INCEST AND DOMESTIC ABUSE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, LISTENING AND SUPPORT, IN AND ACROSS THE UK. (2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING RAPE SEXUAL HARASSMENT AND ABUSE AND DOMESTIC ABUSE AND ITS EFFECT BOTH ON ITS VICTIMS AND ON THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 FISHER STREET
CARLISLE
CA3 8RR
- Phone:
- 01228 515859
- Email:
- Office@safetynetuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window