BURBAGE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUNDS CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run a village hall and recreation grounds for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Administrative Parish of Burbage, Wiltshire, without any distinction, and provide facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation for anyone who has need of such facilities and in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 20 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William TITMUSS | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane BROWN | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DOVE | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul LARSMON | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DRUMMOND FELLOWS | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE LESLEY ANGELL | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.63k | £11.56k | £24.58k | £13.07k | £14.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.61k | £9.92k | £13.23k | £9.28k | £14.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.57k | £13.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUNDS AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE PARISH OF BURBAGE ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burbage Village Hall
60 Eastcourt Road
Burbage
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 3AJ
- Phone:
- 07791615743
- Email:
- bvhwilts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window