NOTTINGHAM CASTLE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation,restoration,maintenance, repair and improvement of Nottingham castle,its architectural heritage,grounds and its collections relating to archaeology, the natural sciences, natural history,literature,music, the fine and decorative arts antiques- to advance the education of the public in the history of Nottingham castle, its collections and local history
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- NOTTINGHAM CASTLE HERITAGE AND EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.06k | £880.55k | £352.06k | £139.98k | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.08k | £1.03m | £723.49k | £630.57k | £372 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £875.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £5.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.03m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
27 March 2023 | 55 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (1) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF NOTTINGHAM CASTLE, ITS ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE, GROUNDS AND ITS COLLECTIONS RELATING TO ARCHAEOLOGY, THE NATURAL SCIENCES, NATURAL HISTORY, LITERATURE, MUSIC, THE FINE AND DECORATIVE ARTS AND ANTIQUITIES; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF NOTTINGHAM CASTLE, ITS COLLECTIONS AS EXEMPLIFIED ABOVE AND LOCAL HISTORY; (3) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window