COVENANT CHRISTIAN CENTRE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church holds regular public worship services, prayer meetings, bible study, children's Sunday school, seminars on faith, family life, parenting ,setting goals etc.The Church also distributes literature to the general public through social media. The church provides counselling and welfare services to those that need it in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Kent
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 July 2015: CIO registration
- COVENANT CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr UVIE BRIGUE | Chair | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEANNETTE KOUASSI | Trustee | 03 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
IBIYEMI IFEDERU | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.51k | £60.09k | £71.14k | £298.02k | £471.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.56k | £47.33k | £55.09k | £231.13k | £430.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN BROMLEY, KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Merewood Close
BROMLEY
BR1 2AN
- Phone:
- 07830169720
- Email:
- ubrigue@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window