REACT Disaster Response Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To respond to domestic and international disasters; in so doing give a sense of purpose, community, and identity to ex-military personnel. Response teams aim to bring to bear the best skills and expertise from the military, first responders, and civilians in order to coordinate the best possible, most timely, and best integrated response.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£992,019
Donations and legacies | £672.58k | |
Charitable activities | £31.28k | |
Other trading activities | £286.49k | |
Investments | £1.67k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,522,029
Raising funds | £511.88k | |
Charitable activities | £2.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £193,755 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £511.88k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.01m |
People

30 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
664 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 August 2015: Standard registration
- RE:ACT (Working name)
- RE:ACT Disaster Response Limited (Previous name)
- TEAM RUBICON UK (Previous name)
- TRUK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GENERAL SIR NICHOLAS RALPH PARKER CBE | Chair | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Coates | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Wills | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Nohr | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Isabel Fernandez Utges Manley | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Burr Noland Carter | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Wilson | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATE HOLT | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £912.29k | £8.09m | £12.02m | £2.28m | £992.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16m | £6.39m | £10.34m | £3.05m | £2.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £542.97k | £2.59m | N/A | £193.76k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £852.67k | £1.22m | £242.40k | £1.40m | £672.58k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £59.62k | £6.08m | £11.51m | £658.44k | £286.49k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £793.77k | £259.59k | £223.64k | £31.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £250 | £403 | £383 | £1.67k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £998.74k | £1.10m | £1.10m | £2.05m | £2.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £159.38k | £5.29m | £9.24m | £999.07k | £511.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £41.88k | £59.94k | £86.77k | £44.94k | £5.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £25.64k | £21.79k | £24.26k | £19.34k | £28.53k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £209.68k | £3.52m | £3.91m | £2.95m | £1.26m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £172.84k | £1.78m | £499.50k | £304.27k | £157.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUN 2015 as amended on 19 May 2020 as amended on 02 Jul 2020 as amended on 14 Apr 2023 as amended on 05 Jul 2023 as amended on 22 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
3.1.1 the relief and assistance for the affected population of natural hazards and disasters, conflict, catastrophe or other crises anywhere in the world get the humanitarian assistance they require. To deliver this by the rapid deployment of vetted, skilled, experienced and well-equipped emergency response teams, composed of humanitarian volunteers, many of whom are armed forces veterans, and together provide humanitarian aid from the moment a disaster or catastrophe occurs to the point at which conventional disaster relief organisations are able to respond, and on an on-going basis. 3.1.2 the relief and assistance for communities in the United Kingdom who are affected by natural hazards and disasters or critical incident, by providing volunteers as referred to in article 3.1.1 to support and complement where needed the responses of emergency services and other national and regional organisations to such occurrences; 3.1.3 to develop the capacity and skills of communities in the United Kingdom and around the world to reduce the risks associated with natural hazards, humanitarian crises, or the impacts of climate change through the deployment of volunteers referred to in article 3.1.1 as part of resilience, mitigation, and capacity strengthening programmes; and 3.1.4 the training and mentoring of armed services veterans by using their skills and experience to deliver humanitarian operations and programmes referred to in articles 3.1.1, 3.1.2, & 3.1.3 to support their transition, skills development, employment prospects and wellbeing.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rooms 4-11
First Floor
Building 8
Chilmark Estates
Chilmark
Ssalisbu
- Phone:
- 03003309488
- Email:
- info@re-act.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.