NEWFOUND FRIENDS UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run sponsored rescue days where able bodied and disabled adults and children can participate and be rescued by our dogs. We hold water safety training days for children. We take the dogs to visit schools, hospitals and hospices. We give talks using our activities with the dogs to promote water safety. We aim to make all our activities fully inclusive, fun and educational.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- Cardiff
- City Of London
- City Of Swansea
- Conwy
- Gloucestershire
- Isle Of Wight
- Milton Keynes
- Portsmouth City
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 August 2015: CIO registration
- 22 August 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 22 August 2023: Funds transferred to 294606 HOLLY HEDGE ANIMAL SANCTUARY
- NEW FOUND FRIENDS UK (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.13k | £902 | £1.09k | £464 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £868 | £273 | £844 | £5.38k | £669 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 September 2020 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 September 2020 | 87 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BY TRAINING THE DOGS AND HANDLERS IN LIFESAVING SKILLS AND USING THE LIFESAVING SKILLS BY INVOLVING DISABLED AND ABLE-BODIED PEOPLE IN WATER RESCUE EVENTS. TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING LIFE-SAVING TRAINING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window