DARULELM EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT CENTRE

Charity number: 1167822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our charity is standing to support local community with their culture, education and the youth activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Brent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 June 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DARUL ELM ISLAMIC FORUM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAID MOHAMED ABDALLAH Chair 23 June 2016
None on record
Guled Abdiaziz Mahamed Trustee 05 June 2023
None on record
Suhayla Haitham Shaban Trustee 05 June 2023
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 March 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 June 2023 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 June 2023 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 June 2023 851 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
62 Craven Park Road
LONDON
NW10 4AE
Phone:
07961093275