Trustees LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1163520

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMIE MATTHEW ANDERSON | Chair | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr CAROLINE SARAH BEARDSMORE | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Paul Farmery | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Castleman | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Bellamy | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Musson | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gair Ross Stuart | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Heath | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Lee Turner | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Andrew Collier | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BRIAN OWEN CROOKES | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PETTY | Trustee | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.