Financial history 5IVES COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB

Charity number: 1181387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £126.53k £194.55k £155.32k £137.69k £158.09k
Total expenditure £107.28k £132.74k £227.70k £146.63k £162.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £82.72k N/A N/A N/A