5IVES COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO FOOTBALL AND HOCKEY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 02 January 2019: Standard registration
- 5IVES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD SMITH | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL HENRY | Trustee | 11 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
RONNIE KILPATRICK | Trustee | 11 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.53k | £194.55k | £155.32k | £137.69k | £158.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.28k | £132.74k | £227.70k | £146.63k | £162.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | £82.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 AUG 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 AUG 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO FOOTBALL AND HOCKEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5ives Community Sports Club
Burnsall Grove
BARNSLEY
S70 3JR
- Phone:
- 01226 771 442
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window