SW9 COMMUNITY HOUSING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides for the benefit of the community in the Stockwell Park area, property management and maintenance services and associated amenities for persons in necessitous circumstances including the aged. The charity also provides activities seeking to prevent and/or relieve poverty and provides recreational and leisure time facilities with the object of improving conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,520,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £11.52m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£12,506,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £12.51m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.51m |
People

44 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
2500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
Governance
- 06 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tazeem Zahra Abbas | Chair | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Peter Atlee Hunt | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maysel Yankey | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mercedes Ekanem | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ross Heilbronn | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aniko Ajozi | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Bryan | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Paul Knoll-Pollard | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Paul Warren | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sternberg | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adebayo Vincent Ajibade | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.03m | £8.68m | £9.47m | £10.95m | £11.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.94m | £8.30m | £9.26m | £10.87m | £12.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.03m | £8.68m | £9.27m | £10.95m | £11.52m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £201.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.94m | £8.30m | £9.26m | £10.87m | £12.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £139.00k | £0 | £85.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.91m | £4.65m | £3.09m | £2.51m | £2.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.14m | £3.51m | £1.74m | £1.09m | £2.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 AUG 2015 as amended on 23 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 3.1 TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING AND MANAGING HOUSING AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 3.2 PROVIDING FOR AGED PERSONS IN THE NEED THEREOF IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ANY HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES ESPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADOPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3.3 THE PREVENTION AND/OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND SURROUNDING AREAS; AND 3.4 THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND SURROUNDING AREAS TO THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.5 EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS THE COMPANY SHALL AT ALL TIMES ACTIVELY PROMOTE AND TAKE INTO CONSIDERATION THE PRINCIPLES OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SW9 COMMUNITY HOUSING
6 Stockwell Park Walk
LONDON
SW9 0FG
- Phone:
- 02073263700
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window