Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, HOOK-WITH-WARSASH

Charity number: 1162521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £132.33k £138.08k £322.91k £189.28k £157.21k
Total expenditure £123.42k £119.03k £282.53k £225.22k £163.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £3.38k £33.64k £1.89k