THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, HOOK-WITH-WARSASH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parochial Church Council of St. Mary, Hook with Warsash
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £1,888 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
49 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 03 July 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S CHURCH, WARSASH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN MICHAEL TERRY | Chair | 03 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Meads | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Arthur Elgin Candlin | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Louise Winterton | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Shepperd | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hamilton Dalzell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Molly Howard | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Ann Buckle | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILLIAM UPWARD | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Kim Stevens | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Joan Yeomans | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN BOTTOMLEY | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAIN KENNETH CHARLES WILKIE | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE SIMPSON | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EVA CHARLOTTE UPWARD | Trustee | 28 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA SUSAN TERRY | Trustee | 03 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.33k | £138.08k | £322.91k | £189.28k | £157.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.42k | £119.03k | £282.53k | £225.22k | £163.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.38k | £33.64k | £1.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church Hall
109 Church Road
Warsash
SOUTHAMPTON
SO31 9GF
- Phone:
- 01489570846
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window