CEIRIOG VALLEY SHEEP DOG SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The sheepdog trials is an open competition and attracts many international competitors. Held at at Tal y Garth Fields, Glyn Ceiriog on the last Friday & Saturday in August. The best 12 sheepdogs compete in the final at 4pm on the Saturday. There are also showing classes for sheep, all breeds of dogs, sheep shearing competitions and horse & pony classes. . An annual dinner is held in Nov/Dec.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wrexham
Governance
- 05 July 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Scott Gilchrist | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Nia Harold | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR BATES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37k | £1.30k | £9.10k | £9.67k | £10.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £378 | £97 | £8.27k | £8.35k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 1977
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FOSTER THE BREEDING, TRAINING AND IMPROVEMENT OF SHEEP DOGS, IN ORDER TO SECURE BETTER MANAGEMENT OF SHEEP FLOCKS IN APRTICULAR (A) BY THE HOLDING OF SHEEP DOG TRIALS ANNUALLY OR AT SUCH INTERVALS AS THE SOCIETY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, WITHIN THE CEIRIOG VALLEY BEING PART OF THE COUNTY OF CLWYD CONSISTING OF THE COMMUNITY COUNCILS OF GLYN TRAIAN, LLANSANTFFRAID GLYN CEIRIOG, LLANGADWALADR, LLANSILIN, LLANARMON DYFFRYN CEIRIOG AND CHIRK IN THE COUNTY OF CLWYD AND WESTON RHYN AND SELATTYN IN THE COUNTY OF SALOP, THE AREA BEING THE BENEFICIAL AREA OF THE SOCIETY, (B) BY THE HOLDING OF OTHER EVENTS, SUCH AS EXHIBITIONS, SHOWS AND FUNCTIONS CONNECTED WITH THE TRIALS OR OTHERWISE IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS (C) BY OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
CEIRIOG VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABERWIEL
NANTYR
LLANGOLLEN
LL20 7DL
- Phone:
- 01691718294
- Email:
- trevor077@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.