Accounts and annual returns FOREVER FAMILIES

Charity number: 1162753
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 April 2022 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 April 2022 80 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 April 2022 445 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 April 2022 445 days late Download Open in new window