Accounts and annual returns ACTION ON CIO

Charity number: 1164287
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 29 May 2024 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 14 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 July 2022 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 14 July 2022 159 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 July 2022 524 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 July 2022 524 days late Download Open in new window