HIGHER DENHAM COMMUNITY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local community charity acting for the benefit of local residents of Higher Denham including overseeing and maintaining the community hall and the community playing field, organising community events and acting as a conduit between the local community and the parish and district councils and other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £750 from 1 government contract(s) and £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 15 September 2015: CIO registration
- 06 July 2016: Funds received from 300278 HIGHER DENHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- HDC CIO (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ward | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Clarke | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Emma Dover | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Orlaith Kate Carney | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mansoor Manjlai | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bryant | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Blyth | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ron JAMES | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.05k | £19.23k | £24.53k | £26.83k | £254.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.86k | £14.84k | £17.97k | £15.72k | £22.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £750 | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | £10.60k | £8.50k | £5.50k | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: A)PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B)PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wind in the Willows
Lower Road
Denham
UXBRIDGE
UB9 5EN
- Phone:
- 01895833518
- Email:
- committee@hdca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window