PLYMOUTH HOCKEY CLUB

Charity number: 1166724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Friendly and supportive local Hockey club, providing our youngsters with good coaching programme, regular training sessions and the involvement in leagues and competitions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,236
Total expenditure: £4,038

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Plymouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PHC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rob White Chair 24 March 2013
None on record
Angela May Trustee 12 March 2023
None on record
Emily Boucher Trustee 12 March 2023
None on record
Glyn Parry Trustee 12 March 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.01k £5.13k £5.13k £8.24k £8.24k
Total expenditure £4.63k £3.71k £3.71k £4.04k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 April 2023 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2023 665 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Wellington Street
Torpoint
Cornwall
PL11 2DE
Phone:
07861 250682