THE 1815 CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial support for Brasenose College Boat Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 July 2015: CIO registration
- THE BOWMAN FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL BROCKLEBANK | Chair | 22 April 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
Elisabeth Smith | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Katrina Lythgoe | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Peter Edmondson | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laura Harray | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joseph Keel | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Foster | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Natasha Perks | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Philip Christopher Liam Parker | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.74k | £17.33k | £61.11k | £12.00k | £28.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.19k | £2.67k | £720 | £46.69k | £18.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FACILITATE PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY THROUGH PROMOTION OF THE SPORTS OF ROWING, SCULLING AND COXING AT ALL LEVELS OF ABILITY AND DISABILITY (AS SUCH SPORTS MAY DEVELOP OVER TIME) AT BRASENOSE COLLEGE, OXFORD (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 1143447) (THE "COLLEGE").
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Gardens
ESHER
KT10 8QF
- Phone:
- 07958295332
- Email:
- trustees@thebowmanfund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window