Financial history BISHOP'S STORTFORD COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB

Charity Number: 1171519
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £16.45k £6.01k £0 £39.34k £20.65k
Total expenditure £7.40k £3.80k £4.14k £39.19k £2.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A