Trustees BISHOP'S STORTFORD COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB
Charity Number: 1171519

Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL CARTER | Chair | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robert Burslem | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Keith Smith | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tanys Elizabeth Lancaster | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Pennison | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD JAMES COTTON MBE | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.