EAST RIDING THEATRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
East Riding Theatre is an exciting venture and a prime example of how a community project has regenerated a disused building to create a vibrant, outward looking, viable, professional theatre venue for locals, visitors, tourists and artists that provides employment and volunteering opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Leonard Gladwin | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Julia Jordan | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Andrew Loncaster | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS WADE | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE COOPER BA DIP TP | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT REGAN | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.38k | £205.52k | £279.86k | £330.17k | £477.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £387.66k | £173.51k | £339.68k | £339.38k | £473.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.50k | £122.70k | £9.45k | £20.60k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 AUG 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PRODUCTION OF PERFORMANCE ART, INCLUDING DRAMA, MUSIC, DANCE AND OTHER PERFORMING ARTS, AND BY ENCOURAGING AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE UNDERSTANDING, APPRECIATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF PERFORMING ARTS, CREATIVE ARTS AND VISUAL ARTS. AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS, TO PROVIDE AND MANAGE A THEATRE AND PERFORMANCE VENUE IN BEVERLEY, EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Riding Theatre Ltd
10 Lord Roberts Road
BEVERLEY
HU17 9BE
- Phone:
- 01482 874050
- Email:
- anne@eastridingtheatre.co.uk
- Website:
-
eastridingtheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window