CIVITAS MAXIMA (UNITED KINGDOM)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists victims of war crimes by recording evidence
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Liberia
Governance
No other names
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2017 | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2018 | 15 February 2019 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2017 | 26 June 2018 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE COMPLIANCE WITH INTERNATIONAL AND UK MUNICIPAL LAW AGAINST TORTURE, WAR CRIMES, GENOCIDE AND CRIMES AGAINST HUMANITY; (2) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS ( AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS), THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (1) PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND LEGAL REPRESENTATION TO VICTIMS OF INTERNATIONAL CRIMES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO TORTURE, WAR CRIMES, CRIMES AGAINST HUMANITY AND GENOCIDE; (2) OBTAINING AND PRESERVING EVIDENCE OF SUCH CRIMES FOR USE IN PROSECUTIONS; (3) SECURING THE PROSECUTION OF THE PERPETRATORS OF SUCH CRIMES EITHER BEFORE THE INTERNATIONAL CRIMINAL COURT OR BEFORE ANOTHER NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL COURT OR TRIBUNAL; (4) CREATING AND MAINTAINING FACT FILES FOR VICTIMS OF WAR CRIMES, CRIMES AGAINST HUMANITY AND OTHER INTERNATIONAL CRIMES, FOR EVENTUAL TRANSMISSION TO A NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL PROSECUTING AUTHORITY; (5) PROMOTING WITHIN THE UK AND ON A WORLDWIDE BASIS EFFECTIVE, FAIR AND IMPARTIAL JUSTICE, NOT MOTIVATED BY POLITICAL OR OTHER PARTIAL INTERESTS, FOR VICTIMS OF WAR CRIMES, CRIMES AGAINST HUMANITY AND OTHER INTERNATIONAL CRIMES; (6) TRAINING AND PROMOTING THE TRAINING OF PERSONS AS INVESTIGATORS OF WAR CRIMES, CRIMES AGAINST HUMANITY AND OTHER INTERNATIONAL CRIMES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window