JOSEPHINE'S STAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide support and advice to children and their family's who have experienced or are anticipating the bereavement of a someone significant. We offer advice in both group and 1-1 support provided by trained staff both employed and volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEIF TARRY BSC PGCE | Chair | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Brownbill | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Liza Chapman Gibbs | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.11k | £22.20k | £38.95k | £24.42k | £38.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.68k | £11.88k | £18.55k | £23.27k | £31.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, PRIMARILY IN SOMERSET BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED OR ARE ANTICIPATING THE DEATH OF SOMEONE SIGNIFICANT. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PRE AND POST BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR AMONG PROFESSIONALS AND VOLUNTEERS WORKING WITH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUNG ADULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Wortham Jaques
130A High Street
CREDITON
EX17 3LQ
- Phone:
- 07854220764
- Email:
- info@josephinesstar.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window