THE BURLEY BRIDGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burley Bridge Association was formed in 1996. It aims to build a footbridge over the River Wharfe at Burley-in-Wharfedale on the site of the existing stepping stones, that will benefit the public by providing safe year round access on foot between Burley and the Nidderdale AONB. In addition, to promote an increase in public engagement with healthy outdoor recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 September 2015: CIO registration
- BBA (Working name)
- BURLEY BRIDGE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ALAN EDWARD BAYER | Chair | 01 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GORDON ASHER | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICCOLA SWAN | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.30k | £439 | £7.60k | £8.09k | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £13 | £14.46k | £17.27k | £4.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO BUILD A BRIDGE OVER THE RIVER WHARFE AT BURLEY IN WHARFEDALE ON THE SITE OF THE EXISTING STEPPING STONES, WHICH WILL PROVIDE SAFE YEAR ROUND ACCESS TO RIGHTS OF WAY IN THE NIDDERDALE AREA OF OUTSTANDING NATURAL BEAUTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Southfield Road
Burley in Wharfedale
ILKLEY
LS29 7PB
- Phone:
- 01943862572
- Email:
- burleybridge@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window