THE WHAM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity receives donations from local businesses , and donates its funds and time to other charities that actively encourage and develop young people , who would otherwise be ' on the streets'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 September 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MARK HOLT | Chair | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA HARGREAVES | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATIE ELIZABETH HOLT | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £250.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.27k | £158.92k | £23.57k | £125.86k | £17.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME HELD BY THE TRUST TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS (WHETHER CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED) AT SUCH TIME, IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
What More UK Ltd, Pendle Court
4 Mead Way
Padiham
BURNLEY
BB12 7NG
- Phone:
- 01282687030
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window