Action4Diabetes

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide resources and funding to support young people with Type 1 Diabetes in SE Asian countries to relieve suffering, extend lives and bring hope to the patients and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Laos
- Malaysia
- Philippines
- Thailand
- Vietnam
Governance
- 08 April 2016: CIO registration
- Action4Diabetes (Working name)
- ACTION FOR DIABETICS (Previous name)
- Action4Diabetics (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brigadier RICHARD H D TOOMEY CBE DL | Chair | 06 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Paul Michael Aydinbas | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Setiabudy | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sze May Ng OBE | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY MARK O'BRIEN-GORE BSC | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES EDWARD TOOMEY BSC ECON | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.29k | £236.73k | £219.22k | £204.68k | £448.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.88k | £162.60k | £154.21k | £231.23k | £335.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Apr 2016 as amended on 19 Apr 2021 as amended on 21 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS SUFFERING FROM TYPE 1 DIABETES IN IN MYANMAR, THAILAND, CAMBODIA AND LAOS AND SUCH OTHER LOCATIONS IN EAST ASIA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, AND THE ORGANISATION OF TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Parkfield Road
Taunton
TA1 4RL
- Phone:
- 07847 395009
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window