ARTSOCIAL FOUNDATION


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 18 March 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ArtSocial Foundation is on a mission to use art and arts therapies to transform the lives of disadvantaged and vulnerable children and young people with special needs, life-limiting health conditions or psychological trauma. The Foundation fulfils its mission by providing grants to charities in the UK and Russia that deliver impactful and sustainable programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Azerbaijan
- Kazakhstan
- Russia
- Ukraine
- Uzbekistan
Governance
- 12 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALINA USPENSKAYA | Chair | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Norah Hall | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Areta Nykolia Hryschuk | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lali Margania | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNA SIAKOTOS | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALINA DAVEY | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.53k | £157.19k | £68.00k | £20.45k | £28 | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.76k | £92.60k | £96.00k | £102.14k | £524 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD (SPECIFICALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RUSSIA, THE COMMONWEALTH OF INDEPENDENT STATES, AND THE UNITED KINGDOM) IN THE SUBJECT OF ART AND CULTURE BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT TO ART AND CULTURAL ORGANIZATIONS, PROJECTS AND EXHIBITIONS; B) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF YOUTH, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT; C) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN RUSSIA, THE COMMONWEALTH OF INDEPENDENT STATES, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ANYWHERE ELSE IN THE WORLD ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; AND D) TO ADVANCE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LCLB SUITE 1756
GROUND FLOOR
95 MORTIMER STREET
LONDON
W1W 7GB
- Phone:
- 07599714773
- Email:
- info@artsocial.uk
- Website:
-
artsocial.uk/foundation
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window