DELIA DERBYSHIRE DAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delia Derbyshire Day (DD Day) is an electronic music charity which honours the work of electronic music pioneer Delia Derbyshire (1937-2001). DD Day produces arts heritage events, commissions new art and offers electronic music education centred around the Delia Derbyshire Archive which is held at John Rylands Library in Manchester, UK. We are based in Manchester, UK and operate mainly in England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 December 2015: CIO registration
- DD DAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR DAVID BUTLER | Chair | 20 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sashwati Meera Sengupta | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JENNA ASHTON | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK AYRES | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.12k | £7.95k | £17.86k | £35.34k | £32.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.02k | £6.96k | £17.79k | £4.66k | £58.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC TECHNOLOGY AND THE HISTORY OF BRITISH ELECTRONIC MUSIC VIA THE ARCHIVE AND WORKS OF DELIA DERBYSHIRE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ART OF BRITISH ELECTRONIC MUSIC VIA THE ARCHIVE AND WORKS OF DELIA DERBYSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER
OXFORD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M13 9PL
- Phone:
- 0161 862 0559
- Email:
- deliaderbyshireday@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window