THE SAMOSA MEDIA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage education of British Pakistanis and other communities through raising awareness of issues such as identity, politics, multiculturalism, human rights and development in Pakistan, Britain and elsewhere through arts , media and the provision of global forums and democratic www.thesamosa.co.uk www.thersa.org/pkcalling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 20 January 2016: Standard registration
- THE SAMOSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM HITCHEN | Chair | 02 June 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN PANDIT | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Raja | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.48k | £138.90k | £106.40k | £73.00k | £123.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.02k | £102.54k | £109.13k | £107.00k | £103.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/01/2016
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THE BRITISH-PAKISTANI POPULATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM ABOUT: (A) THE CHALLENGES FACING THE BRITISH-PAKISTANI POPULATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING POVERTY AND UNDER-REPRESENTATION OF BRITISH-PAKISTANIS IN ARTS, SOCIAL POLICY, ACADEMIA AND MEDIA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND (B) THE VARIOUS WAYS IN WHICH THE BRITISH-PAKISTANI POPULATION CAN CONTRIBUTE TO ARTS, CULTURE, JOURNALISM, INTERFAITH WORKING, COMMUNITY COHESION AND CONFLICT RESOLUTION. THIS OBJECT WILL BE ACHIEVED IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING FILMS WITH YOUNG PEOPLE FROM BRITISH-PAKISTANI COMMUNITIES, TO BE USED AS RESOURCES FOR OUTREACH WORK IN AREAS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH LARGE BRITISH-PAKISTANI POPULATIONS, AS WELL AS FOR WIDER CURRICULUM WORK IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES; (B) PUBLISHING NEWS MEDIA ON THE ORGANISATION’S WEBSITE ON THE THEMES OF EDUCATION, CONFLICT RESOLUTION, COMMUNITY COHESION AND WORK IN THE ARTS; AND (C) ORGANISING TALKS, SEMINARS, PANELS, WORKSHOPS, FILM SCREENINGS AND OTHER EVENTS; 1.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THE BRITISH-PAKISTANI POPULATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROMOTING INTER-FAITH AND CROSS-CULTURAL WORK BY ARTISTS IN THE FIELDS OF THEATRE, VISUAL ARTS, FILM, LITERATURE AND MUSIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A) COLLABORATING WITH THEATRES, CINEMAS, CULTURAL CENTRES AND OTHER VENUES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO PRODUCE PLAYS AND ORGANISE EXHIBITIONS, FILM SCREENINGS AND OTHER EVENTS THAT SHOWCASE BRITISH PAKISTANI AND PAKISTANI ARTISTS AND ART FORMS TO A HIGH STANDARD; AND B) WORKING WITH BRITISH AND INTERNATIONAL ORGANISATIONS TO DEVELOP ARTS AND CULTURE PROGRAMMES FOR THE WIDER BRITISH COMMUNITY THAT ALSO SHOWCASE WORK BY BRITISH PAKISTANI AND PAKISTANI ARTISTS. 1.1.3 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; B ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 1.1.4 SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17A Electric Lane ImpactBrixtonHub
Brixton LONDON
Brixton London
SW9 8LA
- Phone:
- 0044 ()7710977381
- Email:
- info@thesamosa.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window