RAGGED EDGE PRODUCTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of the public in the appreciation and understanding of performing arts in all their forms. Ragged Edge aims to develop new work that will have an appeal because of its originality, quality and contemporary relevance.We recognise that the local delivery of live performing arts is important in maintaining the quality of life in a thriving rural community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 November 2015: CIO registration
- RAGGED EDGE (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Elizabeth Timpson | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER ASKEW | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
E. WISE | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.35k | £16.20k | £33.92k | £19.75k | £27.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.11k | £13.20k | £22.42k | £29.70k | £23.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.32k | £23.15k | £5.34k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF PERFORMING ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS, THROUGH THE OPERATION AND MANAGEMENT OF RAGGED EDGE PRODUCTIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHAPEL HOUSE
BASSENTHWAITE
KESWICK
CA12 4QH
- Phone:
- 07949572389
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
raggededgeproductions.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window