Financial history TOTNES AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1164260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.05k £1.71k £10.63k £5.32k £7.58k
Total expenditure £24.45k £93.71k £5.46k £2.40k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.91k N/A N/A