THE JAMES CLARKE AND SARAH FOLEY TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NO ACTIVITIES AS THE CHARITY IS NOW DORMANT. THE ACTIVITY HAS BEEN TAKEN OVER BY THE CLARKE FOLEY CENTRE WITH EFFECT FROM 1ST OCTOBER 2006. ANNUAL ACCOUNTS FOR BOTH THE JAMES CLARKE AND SARAH FOLEY TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY AND THE CLARKE FOLEY CENTRE HAVE ALREADY BEEN SUBMITTED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bradford City
Governance
- 19 July 1977: Standard registration
- THE CLARKE FOLEY TRUST (Working name)
- THE CLARKE-FOLEY CENTRE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Mary Miller | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
THE CLARKE FOLEY CENTRE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 429 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JUNE 1977 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 6 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS AND RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS IN THE AREA OF ILKLEY. (B) TO ESTABLISH A DAY CENTRE IN ILKLEY TO BE KNOWN AS THE JAMES CLARKE AND SARAH FOLEY DAY CENTRE WHICH SHALL BE USED TO MEET THE NEEDS AND PROMOTE THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF ALL ELDERLY PERSONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF CREED OR COLOUR WHO DESIRES TO RESORT TO THE CENTRE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF DEED).
Area of benefit
ILKLEY, ADDINGHAM, BURLEY IN WHARFEDALE AND MENSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Clarke Foley Centre
Cunliffe Road
ILKLEY
LS29 9DZ
- Phone:
- 07442261462
- Email:
- admin@clarkefoley.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window