VICTORIA PARK FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Victoria Park Fellowship provides a place of Christian Worship. Its supports its members and supports chariable christian activities in the UK and abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 21 July 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Armstrong | Trustee | 10 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR Tayo Otokiti | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Malcolm Peter Brook | Trustee | 25 November 1993 |
|
|
||||
MR PETER MARCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.37k | £54.77k | £53.92k | £55.26k | £45.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.03k | £54.17k | £57.40k | £49.24k | £53.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 DECEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chapel
31a Daisy Bank Road
Victoria Park
Manchester
M14 5GP
- Phone:
- 01614450014
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window