Newark and Sherwood Community Hub

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity that provides a centre for community use for a wide range of play and fitness activities in Newark and Sherwood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,192 from 2 government contract(s) and £16,192 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 December 2015: CIO registration
- 20 June 2019: Funds received from 701015 NEWARK AND SHERWOOD COMMUNITY HUB
- NSPSG (Working name)
- NEWARK & SHERWOOD PLAY SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Walsh | Chair | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Moore | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Cassidy | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rutkowska | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Sheffield | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.37k | £51.00k | £45.69k | £35.66k | £35.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.16k | £39.00k | £50.51k | £40.94k | £40.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.76k | £42.60k | £33.49k | £21.02k | £16.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 April 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 April 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Dec 2015 as amended on 29 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY FURTHERING THE DEVELOPMENT OF PLAY FACILITIES AND PLAY OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, BY CO-ORDINAING LOCAL PLAY FORUMS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS OR SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILLGATE COMMUNITY CENTRE
2 PELHAM STREET
-NEWARK
NG244XD
- Phone:
- 01636647121
- Email:
- playsupport@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window