RESTORE COUNSELLING, TRAINING AND RELATED SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restore provides one-to-one counselling for teenagers and adults and play therapy for children. There is also a supervision service for counsellors and professionals, as well as training courses delivered for counsellors, professionals and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 09 November 2015: CIO registration
- RESTORE, RESTORE COUNSELLING SERVICES, BUDDY OF HOPE (BURSARY FUND NAME) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Hill | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Victor McCreath | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linden James Sanders | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.26k | £76.38k | £70.18k | £79.17k | £72.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.57k | £49.81k | £80.99k | £84.99k | £85.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL, SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND THERAPY SERVICES, AND 3.1.2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF LONELINESS, ISOLATION, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. ALL SUCH PURPOSES TO BE CARRIED OUT IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE ATTACHED ON PAGE 16 OF THIS CONSTITUTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 High Street
Tunbridge Wells
TN1 1XU
- Phone:
- 07456267951
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window