Financial history PAUL GRANT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1163283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.00k £112.50k £60.00k £15.00k £55.00k
Total expenditure £42.54k £101.20k £69.59k £15.00k £57.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A