Financial history BARNSLEY MUSEUMS AND HERITAGE TRUST

Charity Number: 1164496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.65k £191.66k £233.85k £265.06k £207.53k
Total expenditure £86.04k £147.60k £130.25k £146.70k £281.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A