BARNSLEY MUSEUMS AND HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barnsley Museums and Heritage Trust is a Development Trust set up to raise funds and support Barnsley Museums which currently include: Cannon Hall, Worsbrough Mill, Cooper Gallery, Elsecar Heritage Centre and Experience Barnsley. Barnsley Museums are owned and operated by Barnsley Metropolitan Borough Council and other properties may join the group in due course.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
Governance
- 20 November 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Exley | Chair | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rose Mary Johnston | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Naseer Ahmed | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily-Rose Gratton-Rayson | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Fielding | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Milly Charlesworth-Constable | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Johnson | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Michael Walker | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.65k | £191.66k | £233.85k | £265.06k | £207.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.04k | £147.60k | £130.25k | £146.70k | £281.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENCOURAGING THE PUBLIC TO PARTICIPATE AND ENGAGE WITH MUSEUMS AND RELATED SERVICES PARTICULARLY THOSE LOCATED WITHIN THE BARNSLEY METROPOLITAN AREA; (2) THE PROMOTION OF ART, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND SCIENCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MUSEUMS AND ATTRACTIONS IN THE BARNSLEY METROPOLITAN AREA SUCH AS EXPERIENCE BARNSLEY, CANNON HALL MUSEUM PARK AND GARDENS, WORSBOROUGH MILL AND COUNTRY PARK; ELSECAR HERITAGE CENTRE AND COOPER GALLERY; AND (3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE PROVIDED THAT SUCH PURPOSES SHALL BE OF AN EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE NATURE. PLEASE NOTE THAT THE CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED USES THE CHARITY COMMISSION MODEL CONSTITUTION FOR FOUNDATION CIOS WITH VARIANCES FROM THIS HIGHLIGHTED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnsley Metropolitan Borough
Council
Town Hall
Church Street
BARNSLEY
S70 2TA
- Phone:
- 01226787506
- Email:
- info@bmht.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window