DALE FARM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ProvidesTraining for Adults with Learning Difficulties in an Organic Horticultural environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wirral
Governance
- 11 September 1978: Standard registration
- 15 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 15 August 2016: Funds transferred to 1156516 THE DALE FARM TRUST
- DALE FARM ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- DALE FARM SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE DALE FARM ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.41k | £23.78k | £27.89k | £27.88k | £40.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.95k | £21.57k | £17.17k | £27.29k | £37.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 14 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 14 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 13 November 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1984 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/1987 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 25/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN HORTICULTURAL ACTIVITIES AT DALE FARM HESWALL, WIRRAL, IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE WIRRAL BOROUGH SOCIAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT, IN ORDER TO PROVIDE THERAPY FOR ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
WIRRAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window