MEETING POINT MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a place where the public can meet for spiritual guidance. Once a month we provide hot meals for the public. We also have a clothes drive where the public can pick up suitable items of clothing for an interview or a special occasion. Our religious and non-religious services are available to all members of the public. There are no exemptions or preferences or costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 28 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Crystal Russell | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paulette Johnson | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Petal Jones | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.80k | £17.19k | £18.61k | £16.45k | £23.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.26k | £8.71k | £15.61k | £13.90k | £23.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 March 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS("OBJECTS")ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THEY ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF LAMBETH, SOUTHWARK AND CROYDON AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF LAMBETH, SOUTHWARK AND CROYDON BY PROVIDING: CLOTHING AND/OR FOOD TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF LAMBETH, SOUTHWARK AND CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRAISE HOUSE
145-151 LONDON ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 2RG
- Phone:
- 07775299710
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window