DAN'S DEN AT CHRISTCHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dan's Den at Christchurch is a soft play centre in the heart of Ilkley which aims to -provide facilities run with a Christian ethos in the interests of social welfare for recreation or leisure time occupation of individuals. -advance the Christian Faith -support other UK or overseas charities as the Trustees may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 14 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Henney | Chair | 18 March 2020 |
|
|||||
David Arvin Shaw | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dybeck | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marianne Meredith | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Frederick Dixon | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
REV Roberta Topham | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANNE HAESTIER | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL JOANNE WALES-SMITH | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr SARAH JOWETT | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.89k | £64.27k | £97.43k | £116.34k | £118.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.12k | £72.18k | £95.46k | £114.66k | £131.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £57.73k | £15.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 March 2022 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUN 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1 THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES RUN WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ILKLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE ILKLEY METHODIST CHURCH AND ILKLEY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY SUPPORTING: 4.2.1 PASTORAL WORK; 4.2.2 MISSION AND EVANGELISM; 4.2.3 THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND 4.2.4 THE CELEBRATION OF PUBLIC WORSHIP; AND 4.3 THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS FOR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dan's Den at Christchurch
21 The Grove
ILKLEY
LS29 9LW
- Phone:
- 01943603903
- Email:
- dansden@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window