THE ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA BACH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performing classical music concerts & workshops in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 July 1977: Standard registration
- 20 January 2025: Funds received from 1093543 THE SAINT JAMES' SINGERS
- RLSBC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Taulbut | Chair | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Deards | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith ROBINSON | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.33k | £9.16k | £31.52k | £43.87k | £52.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.59k | £12.73k | £32.09k | £42.57k | £52.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF 31/01/1954 AND AMENDED 6/4/1977,5/7/1978,6/7/1979,7/9/1983,1/7/1987. AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS OF CHORAL MUSIC AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Park Road
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV32 6LG
- Phone:
- 07713832217
- Email:
- treasurer@rlsbc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window