THE HICKMAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education and training for apprentices and undergraduate engineers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 October 2015: Standard registration
- 09 November 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 November 2023: Funds transferred to 206882 THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.25k | £20.53k | £4.10k | £12.98k | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.30k | £21.00k | £13.10k | £11.50k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19/10/2015
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS ARE: 2.2.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 30 IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY: 2.2.1.1 WHOLLY OR PARTIALLY FUNDING APPRENTICESHIPS FOR SUCH PERSONS OFFERED BY BUSINESSES OPERATING ANYWHERE IN ENGLAND AND WALES; 2.2.1.2 AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; 2.2.2 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 30 BY PROVIDING THEM WITH SUPPORT (INCLUDING BUSINESS START-UP GRANTS) THAT WILL ENABLE THEM TO START AND RUN THEIR OWN BUSINESSES AND SO DEVELOP SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES THAT WILL ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window