KROPIFKO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAIN AIMS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO ASSIST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN POVERTY IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY; PREVENTING OR RELIEVING POVERTY, ADVANCING AND PROMOTING EDUCATION AND PROVIDING RELIEF FROM SICKNESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM KAYE | Chair | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA SANSON | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL KAYE | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.21k | £71.89k | £57.76k | £111.62k | £115.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.00k | £90.47k | £47.95k | £130.81k | £99.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 APR 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN POVERTY IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND FUNDING TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; (2) TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND FUNDING TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD; (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH THEY COULD OTHERWISE NOT AFFORD; (4) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN POVERTY IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TO SUCH PERSONS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS; (5) TO RELIEVE SICK-POOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR HEALTHCARE TREATMENTS, GOODS OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD OTHERWISE NOT AFFORD; (6) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF SICK AND SERIOUSLY ILL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES (AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FUNDING AND PROVIDING GRANTS TO PAY FOR ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES TO CARE FOR AND SUPPORT THE SICK AND SERIOUSLY ILL AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, TO ENSURE THAT THEY HAVE THE BEST POSSIBLE QUALITY OF LIFE; AND (7) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCING OF EDUCATION AND PREVENTING AND RELIEVING POVERTY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO INDIVIDUALS OR ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER CHARITIES THAT SUPPORT SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A DOWNSHIRE HILL
LONDON
NW3 1NR
- Phone:
- 02077947600
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window